Keogh, Kelly Annette (CPSO#: 65128)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1880 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L2L1
Phone: 416 285 7575
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelly A. Keogh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Keogh ( CPSO# 65128 )

Business Address:
152 - 1880 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1L 2L1
Phone Number: (416) 285-7575

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELLY ANNETTE KEOGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEOGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993