Keough, Valerie Joan (CPSO#: 81681)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 May 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
c/o Sylvia Aceti
1-PMB 286 585 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V Keough Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Keough ( CPSO# 81681 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
c/o Sylvia Aceti
1 - PMB 286 - 585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 430-4800

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2G4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3111

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Department of Medical Imaging
Toronto ON  M5G 2Z9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-2581

Business Address:
Markham Stouville Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 596-4200

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Department Of Medical Imaging
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 16 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALERIE JOAN KEOUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEOUGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2018