Kepron, Charis Anthea (CPSO#: 81023)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Forensic Pathology Service
Eastern ON Forensic Pathology Unit
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8860
Fax: (613) 737-8619
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Pathology Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARIS ANTHEA KEPRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEPRON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2010