Kern, Melissa Anne (CPSO#: 84978)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church St.
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: 905-472-7000 Ext. 1124
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Manitouwadge General Hospital Manitouwadge
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA ANNE KERN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KERN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 16 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012