Kesani, Anil Kumar (CPSO#: 93384)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Jun 2010 to 30 Apr 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2011 to 06 Sep 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Sep 2011