Keshmirian, Jalal (CPSO#: 67128)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7700 Hurontario street
Unit 309B
Brampton, Ontario
Brampton ON  L6Y 4M3
Phone: (905)-846-2388
Fax: (905) 450-1198
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

630 Peter Robertson Blvd, unit 15
Brampton, Ontario
Brampton ON  L6R 1T4
Canada
Phone: 905-793-8868
Fax: 905-793-8957
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

9-225 The East Mall
Etobicoke,
Toronto ON  M9B 6J1
Canada
Phone: 416-231-7743
Fax: 416-231-3974
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Keshmirian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Keshmirian ( CPSO# 67128 )

Business Address:
15 - 630 Peter Robertson
Brampton ON  L6R 1T4
Phone Number: (905) 793-8868

Business Address:
186 Main Street South
Brampton ON  L6W 2E2
Phone Number: (905) 456-7774

Business Address:
9 - 225 East Mall
Etobicoke ON  M9B 6J1

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JALAL KESHMIRIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KESHMIRIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995