Keshoofy, Mohammad (CPSO#: 82076)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
Department of General Surgery
P O Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 33
180 Parsons Road
P O Box 382
Alliston ON  L9R 1V6
Canada
Phone: (705) 435-0391
Fax: (705) 435-2420
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

105 5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Canada
Phone: (705) 503-3336
Fax: (705) 503-6330
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

9080 Yonge Street, Unit 12
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Canada
Phone: (289)597-7676
Fax: (289)597-7675
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Keshoofy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Keshoofy ( CPSO# 82076 )

Business Address:
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent, PO Box 4000
Department of General Surgery
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 435-6281

Business Address:
P.O. Box 382
33 - 180 Parsons Road
Alliston ON  L9R 1V6
Phone Number: (705) 435-0391

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Mar 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD KESHOOFY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KESHOOFY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008