Keunen, Johannes Elisabeth Gerardus Maria (CPSO#: 83977)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, German

Education:Maastricht University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Ontario Power Generation Bldg
Suite 3-903
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-8808 Ext. 2
Fax: (416) 586-3216
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jul 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective: 14 Aug 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 25 Mar 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Aug 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 14 Aug 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Aug 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Johannes   Elisabeth   Gerardus   Maria   Keunen  may  practise  medicine
            independently in obstetrics and gynaecology.