Kfouri, Julia Eva (CPSO#: 90841)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 University Ave
Suite 3-902
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416)5863195
Fax: (416)5865223
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julia Eva Kfouri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kfouri ( CPSO# 90841 )

Business Address:
700 University Avenue
Suite 3-902
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 589-3195

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIA EVA KFOURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KFOURI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2014