Khakhar, Anand Kantilalbhai (CPSO#: 77020)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Saurashtra University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Aug 2001 to 27 Aug 2002
Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Aug 2002 to 27 Aug 2003
Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Mar 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004