Khalid, Hasan Farid (CPSO#: 79086)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit C7
4555 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L4Z 3M1
Phone: (905) 507-4300
Fax: (905) 507-4308
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Khalid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Khalid ( CPSO# 79086 )

Business Address:
Unit C7
4555 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L4Z 3M1
Phone Number: (905) 507-4300

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HASAN FARID KHALID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2005