Khalid, Salman Farid (CPSO#: 86944)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte Street
Milton, ON
L9T 9K1
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone: (905) 876-7606
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SF Khalid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khalid ( CPSO# 86944 )

Business Address:
725 Bronte Street
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone Number: (905) 829-2421

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Nov 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALMAN FARID KHALID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2010