Khalid, Zahira (CPSO#: 83113)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Internal Medicine
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 32739
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zahira Khalid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Khalid ( CPSO# 83113 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Internal Medicine
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZAHIRA KHALID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2009