Khalid-Khan, Sarosh (CPSO#: 88256)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Dow Medical College, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Division of Child/Adol. Psychiatry
166 Brock Street, Brock 5; #562
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 2554
Fax: (613) 544-7623
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Khalid-Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khalid-Khan ( CPSO# 88256 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Suite B5-025
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAROSH KHALID-KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALID-KHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2017