Khambati, Aziz Moiz (CPSO#: 92816)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
400-18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone: 905-793-0500
Fax: 905-793-0001
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

345-955 Queen St. E
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Canada
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AZIZ MOIZ KHAMBATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAMBATI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2017