Khan, Abdul Aleem (CPSO#: 74225)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Jun 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3955 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1J5
Phone: 5199155565
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdul Aleem Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khan ( CPSO# 74225 )

Business Address:
3955 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1J5
Phone Number: (519) 915-5565

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 04 Jun 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 11 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2000 to 31 Aug 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2001 to 31 Aug 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Aug 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Abdul Aleem Khan may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.