Khan, Anees Ayub (CPSO#: 80559)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Hindi, Kannada, Tamil, Urdu

Education:Bangalore University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1340 El Paseo Court
Greely ON  K4P 0C4
Phone: (613) 618-0601
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2430 Bank Street unit 5
Ottawa ON  K1V 0T7
Canada
Phone: (613) 736-6946 Ext. 4
Fax: (613) 736-6948
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anees Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khan ( CPSO# 80559 )

Business Address:
Unit 3
2430 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 0T7

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Aug 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANEES AYUB KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 22 Mar 2004 to 28 May 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 29 May 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 28 Sep 2007 to 23 Nov 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Nov 2007 to 30 Jul 2008
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2011