Khan, Farhana Ahmed (CPSO#: 89243)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Medical Care Centre
Unit 6
1 Bartley Bull Parkway
Brampton ON  L6W 2J3
Phone: (905) 450-2981
Fax: (905) 450-2532
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Farhana Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 15 2015


Corporation Name: Mujtaba Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 26 2017


Corporation Name: Farhana Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 89561 )
Dr. F. Khan ( CPSO# 89243 )

Business Address:
Suite 6
1 Bartley Bull Parkway
Brampton ON  L6W 2J3
Phone Number: (905) 450-2981


Corporation Name: Mujtaba Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 89561 )
Dr. F. Khan ( CPSO# 89243 )

Business Address:
The Medical Care Centre
Unit 6
1 Bartley Bull Parkway
Brampton ON  L6W 2J3
Phone Number: (905) 450-2981

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARHANA AHMED KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2009