Khan, Farrukh Abbas (CPSO#: 90176)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:King Edward Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 319
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 281-5426
Fax: (416) 281-3600
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Farrukh Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 19 2016


Corporation Name: Dr. Farrukh Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. Farrukh Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Khan ( CPSO# 90176 )

Business Address:
319 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 281-5426

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7375

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 27 Mar 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARRUKH ABBAS KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2009