Khan, Hashmat Uddin (CPSO#: 79010)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2291 Kipling Avenue
Rexdale ON  M9W 4L6
Phone: (416) 741-4545
Fax: (416) 744-1484
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hashmat Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Khan ( CPSO# 79010 )

Business Address:
2291 Kipling Avenue
Rexdale ON  M9W 4L6
Phone Number: (416) 741-4545

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HASHMAT UDDIN KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2005