Khan Hazaratoola, Irfan Pathan Yusuf (CPSO#: 90438)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Mumbai, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Airways Clinic
Suite 405
1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone: (705) 478-6888
Fax: 705 478 8711
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Irfan Khan Hazaratoola Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Khan Hazaratoola ( CPSO# 90438 )

Business Address:
Suite 405
1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone Number: (705) 478-6888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 19 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRFAN PATHAN YUSUF KHAN HAZARATOOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN HAZARATOOLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2009 to 24 Jul 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2014