Khan, Hifsa (CPSO#: 92177)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1010 Kennedy Circle, Unit 1D
Milton ON  L9T 0J9
Phone: (905) 8648787
Fax: 9058641522
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HIFSA KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Oct 2009 to 12 Jan 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2010 to 19 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2011