Khan, Luluel Maknun (CPSO#: 89045)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  M4L 3T6
Phone: 9058131100 Ext. 4803
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Khan ( CPSO# 89045 )

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LULUEL MAKNUN KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 23 Jan 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2014