Khan, M. Gabriel (CPSO#: 22166)

Current Status: Expired: Member deceased as of 09 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jul 2018

Summary

Date of Death: 9-Jul-2018

Former Name: Khan, Muzrudeen (used until: 12 Oct 1982 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Medical records are located at the Estate of Dr. Muzrudeen Gabriel Khan c/o Michael W. Cooligan Law Office 502 Hartleigh Ave Ottawa ON K2B 5J6 Tel: 613-725-3446 Fax: 613-725-2977
Date Received: 06 Nov 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1969
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 09 Jul 2018