Khan, Mohammed Viqar Ali (CPSO#: 75622)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jan 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jan 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Osmania University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 213
1060 Speers Road
Oakville ON  L6L 2X4
Phone: (905) 842-5455
Fax: (905) 842-7788
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Viqar Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 75622 )

Business Address:
213 - 1060 Speers Road
Oakville ON  L6L 2X4
Phone Number: (905) 842-5455

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED VIQAR ALI KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2000
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2007