Khan, Mustufa Zafar (CPSO#: 81024)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 433-4305
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bowmanville X-ray & Ultrasound
222 King St. E., Suite 1101
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Canada
Phone: (905) 623-4512
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Baywood X-ray and Ultrasound
Durham Radiology Associates Inc.
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Canada
Phone: (905) 428-0444
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Durham Radiology Associates Inc.
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Lakeridge Health, Bowmanville
47 Liberty Street
Bowmanville, ON
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 433-4305
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Levine Myers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rastogi ( CPSO# 68153 )
Dr. A. Myers ( CPSO# 61041 )
Dr. V. Massaad ( CPSO# 75329 )
Dr. R. Levine ( CPSO# 78178 )
Dr. G. Lacey ( CPSO# 67159 )
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 81024 )
Dr. N. Isaac ( CPSO# 71092 )
Dr. G. Dotsikas ( CPSO# 66718 )
Dr. G. Donsky ( CPSO# 73822 )
Dr. M. Asch ( CPSO# 52679 )
Dr. W. Wei ( CPSO# 86891 )
Dr. A. Raikhlin ( CPSO# 86803 )
Dr. S. Galante ( CPSO# 98914 )

Business Address:
Bowmanville X-Ray & Ultrasound
1101 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-2727

Business Address:
Baywood X-Ray & Ultrasound
Baywood Medical Clinic
101 - 95 Bayly Avenue
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 428-0444

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
King Street X-Ray & Ultrasound
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-7702


Corporation Name: Mustufa Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 81024 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health, Bowmanville
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
451 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-7321

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa Department
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUSTUFA ZAFAR KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 26 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009