Khan, Omar Daniel Manan (CPSO#: 76350)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
ODK Physical Medicine
Hotel Dieu Shaver Rehab Centre
Medical Clinic South
547 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2T 4C2
Phone: (905) 685-1381 Ext. 85201
Fax: (905) 685-5390
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Omar D. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Khan ( CPSO# 76350 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Shaver Health and
Rehabilitation Centre
547 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2T 4C2
Phone Number: (905) 685-1381

Business Address:
500 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 3A1
Phone Number: (905) 688-5550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OMAR DANIEL MANAN KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2006