Khan, Ruhe Saba (CPSO#: 81457)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Ahmadu Bello University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Market Place
Suite 4
Toronto ON  M4C 5M1
Phone: (416) 690-3412
Fax: 416 690 6734
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Apr 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUHE SABA KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 29 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2007