Khan, Rukhshanda Jabeen (CPSO#: 72011)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Karachi, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Nov 1998
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1998