Khan, Sabina Imran (CPSO#: 85785)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Pushto, Urdu

Education:Quaid-i-Azam University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cypress Regional Hospital
2004 Saskatchewan Drive
Swift Current SK  S9H 5M8
Phone: (306) 778-9400
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.I. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 20 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SABINA IMRAN KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2008 to 14 Apr 2008
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2014