Khan, Saima Waheed (CPSO#: 89963)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Ziauddin Medical University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Jacob Pain Center
8920 Woodbine Ave
Suite 102
Markham ON  L3R 9W9
Phone: (905) 305-9484
Fax: (905) 305-7381
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Terry Fox Medical
5380 Terry Fox Way
Unit 10
Mississauga ON  L5V 0A5
Canada
Phone: 905-858-3030
Fax: (905) 858-3031
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Saima W. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khan ( CPSO# 89963 )

Business Address:
Chatham-Kent Family Health Team
20 Emma Street
Chatham ON  N7L 5K5
Phone Number: (519) 354-2172

Business Address:
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAIMA WAHEED KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2008 to 23 Jan 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jan 2009 to 27 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Nov 2009 to 28 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2010