Khan, Sarah (CPSO#: 91455)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Chlidrens Hospital
H S C 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75808
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Khan and M. Zubairi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khan ( CPSO# 91455 )
Dr. M. Zubairi ( CPSO# 90661 )

Business Address:
MCMaster Children's Hospital
HSC 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1

Business Address:
Holland Bloorview kids Rehab
150 Kilgour Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 425-6220

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
McMaster Children's Hospital,Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2013