Khan, Shagufta Usmani (CPSO#: 77309)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Lucknow, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Suite 310, Sunnyside Bldg. East
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6814
Fax: (416) 530-6797
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shagufta Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khan ( CPSO# 77309 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care
Suite 310, Sunnyside Building East
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6814

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAGUFTA USMANI KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2004