Khan, Shahida (CPSO#: 85683)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walker's Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 336-9615
Fax: (905) 336-9650
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shahida Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khan ( CPSO# 85683 )

Business Address:
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walker's Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (905) 336-9615

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jan 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAHIDA KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2006 to 23 Jan 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 24 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2010