Khan, Shahzia (CPSO#: 94511)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
825 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3H7
Phone: (519) 963-1875
Fax: (519) 963-1880
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1210 Southdale Road East
London ON  N6E 1B4
Canada
Phone: (519) 686-0484
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shahzia Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khan ( CPSO# 94511 )

Business Address:
825 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 963-1875

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAHZIA KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2011 to 18 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2012