Khan, Sofia (CPSO#: 97980)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Medicine Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto, ON
M6R 1B5
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6860
Fax: (416) 530-6160
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

27 Roncesvalles Ave., Suite 101
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6947
Fax: (416) 530-6160
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sofia Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khan ( CPSO# 97980 )

Business Address:
Family Medicine Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6860

Business Address:
Suite 101
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone Number: (416) 530-6860

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOFIA KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014