Khan, Tayyab Sami (CPSO#: 96186)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3075 Hospital Gate, Suite 301,
Oakville, ON,
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: (905) 337-0040
Fax: (905) 337-0044
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Wharton Medical Clinic
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Canada
Phone: (833) 962-5359
Fax: 8888251505
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

99 Sinclair Avenue, Unit 106
Georgetown ON  L7G5G1
Canada
Phone: (905) 877-9998
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAYYAB SAMI KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2016