Khan, Yasir H (CPSO#: 93320)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Durham College
Campus Health Centre
2000 Simcoe Street, N.
Oshawa ON  L1H 7L7
Phone: (905) 721-3038
Fax: (905) 721-3133
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yasir H. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Khan ( CPSO# 93320 )

Business Address:
Durham College Campus Health Centre
2000 Simcoe Street North
Oshawa ON  L1H 7L7
Phone Number: (905) 721-3038

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YASIR H KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2015