Khanda, Gul-e (CPSO#: 94568)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Pakistan

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2010 to 19 Dec 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 20 Dec 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016