Khandelwal, Mukesh Kumar Nandlalji (CPSO#: 74451)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Nagpur University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5, 165 Plymouth Road
Welland ON  L3B 3E1
Phone: (905) 734-6111
Fax: 905 688 4646
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Renal Clinic,3rd floor
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 43513
Fax: (905) 641-5218
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khandelwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khandelwal ( CPSO# 94170 )
Dr. M. Khandelwal ( CPSO# 74451 )

Business Address:
Suite C
165 Plymouth Road
Welland ON  L3B 3E1
Phone Number: (905) 735-8131

Business Address:
Renal Clinic
Third Floor
1200 4th Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 376-4647


Corporation Name: Surbhi Khandelwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khandelwal ( CPSO# 94170 )
Dr. M. Khandelwal ( CPSO# 74451 )

Business Address:
Welland County General Hospital
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 732-6111

Business Address:
165 Plymouth Road
Welland ON  L3B 4X8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Apr 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 22 Nov 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUKESH KUMAR NANDLALJI KHANDELWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHANDELWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 05 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2010 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jan 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008