Khanna, Parul (CPSO#: 76284)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Nov 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 2005

Summary

Former Name: Kumar, Parul (used until: 07 Sep 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Alberta, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2200 Eglinton Avenue W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4466
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Parul Khanna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Khanna ( CPSO# 76284 )

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4466

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PARUL KHANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHANNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2005