Khanna, Rahul (CPSO#: 86211)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Delhi, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Max Care Medical Centre
Unit 3
2165 Grosvenor Street
Oakville ON  L6H 7K9
Phone: (905) 338-3107
Fax: (905) 338-6400
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Wanless medical clinic
Unit- 1
10990 Chinguacousy Road
Brampton
Brampton ON  L7A 0P1
Canada
Phone: (905) 846-4952
Fax: (905) 846-9585
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rahul Khanna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Khanna ( CPSO# 86211 )

Business Address:
Medica One Clinic
2165 Grosvenor Street
Oakville ON  L6H 5K9
Phone Number: (647) 969-3439

Business Address:
Wanless Medical Clinic
10990 Chinguacousy Road
Unit 1
Brampton ON  L7A 0P1
Phone Number: (647) 969-3439

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAHUL KHANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHANNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Jun 2007 to 22 Jun 2007
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2009