Khasimuddin, Syed Ameen (CPSO#: 97462)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Apr 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Spanish, Urdu

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 57337
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Apr 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Apr 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 24 Apr 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Syed  Ameen  Khasimuddin  may  practise  medicine independently as a
                  hospitalist, only.