Khimdas, Sarit Subhash (CPSO#: 98060)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
274 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2R 6P9
Phone: (905) 684-8521
Fax: 9056844996
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

166 Brock St
Kingston ON  K7L 4G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-3400
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarit Khimdas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khimdas ( CPSO# 98060 )

Business Address:
3-274 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0B6
Phone Number: (905) 684-8521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARIT SUBHASH KHIMDAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHIMDAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017