Khodabandehloo, Mohammed Reza (CPSO#: 76723)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Jul 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Tabriz University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Midland Apple Tree Ltd
2025 Midland Avenue
Suit 100
Toronto ON  M1P 3E2
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: (416) 4772015
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Danforth Medical Centre
880 Danforth Road
Toronto ON  M1K 1H8
Canada
Phone: (416) 264-4848 Ext. 111
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Kingston-Morningside Medical Clinic
Suite 204
4500 Kingston Road
Toronto ON  M1E 2N9
Canada
Phone: (416) 287-3100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Health Choice Walk-In Clinic
815 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1C9
Canada
Phone: (416) 533-1145
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Main Healthcare
294 Main Street
Suit 301
Toronto ON  M4C 4X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 693-3030
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

390 Steeles Appletree Ltd
1450 Oconnor Drive
Building 1
Suite 20
Toronto ON  M4B 2T8
Canada
Phone: (647) 722-2370
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Health Plus Multi Specialty Medical
640 Eglinton Ave West
Mississauga ON  L5R 3V2
Canada
Phone: (905) 268-0520
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Appletree Medical Group
2077 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Etobicoke ON  M8V 4C2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hurontario Medical Centre
Unit 5
5035 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L4Z 3X7
Canada
Phone: (905) 275-4895
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Markham Kingston Road
Medical Centre
3545 Kingston Road
Scarborough ON  M1M 1R6
Canada
Phone: (416) 266-6600
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Dundas 427 Medical Clinic
4A 2200 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L4X 2V3
Canada
Phone: (905) 232-0720
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Appletree Medical Centre
1-275 Dundas Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3K1
Canada
Phone: (416) 599-5602
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Greystone Medical Centre
8 Greystone Walk Dr
Scarborough ON  M1K 5J2
Canada
Phone: (416) 266-5888
Fax: (647) 341-8880
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Apple Tree Medical Centre
2948 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8T5
Canada
Phone: 613 4820118
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammed Khodabandehloo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khodabandehloo ( CPSO# 76723 )

Business Address:
2948 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8T5
Phone Number: (613) 482-0118

Business Address:
880 Danforth Road
Toronto ON  M1K 1H8
Phone Number: (416) 264-4848

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 18 Aug 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 18 Aug 2014 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 18, 2014, the following term, condition and limitation is
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mohammed Khodabandahloo,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Khodabandahloo has given to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Effective August 18, 2014, Dr. Khodabandahloo has ceased to practice:
                  
                  1.    Arthroscopy
                  
                  2.    Arthroplasty
                  
                  3.    Preoperative or postoperative patient assessments; and
                  
                  4.    Any other surgical practice save and except for minor surgical
                        procedures under local anaesthetic involving the skin and
                        subcutaneous tissues, including such assessments and consultations
                        as are associated with these minor procedures.

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 16, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP.
Download Full Document (PDF)