Khoja, Hatim Abdulrahman M (CPSO#: 94693)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 25 Mar 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Jul 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jul 2013