Khokhotva, Mykola (CPSO#: 88819)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lennox and Addington County
General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone: (613) 354-8240
Fax: (613) 354-8241
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 1060
2109 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8Y 1R8
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-4154
Fax: (519) 254-4158
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Naoum and M. Khokhotva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Naoum ( CPSO# 90621 )
Dr. M. Khokhotva ( CPSO# 88819 )

Business Address:
18 Manitou Crescent West
Amherstview ON  K7N 1S3
Phone Number: (613) 389-1604

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MYKOLA KHOKHOTVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOKHOTVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013