Khokhotva, Vladislav (CPSO#: 82935)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1060
2109 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8Y 1R8
Phone: (519) 254-4154
Fax: (519) 254-4158
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: (519) 254-2469
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vladislav Khokhotva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Khokhotva ( CPSO# 82935 )

Business Address:
1060 - 2109 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8Y 1R8
Phone Number: (519) 254-4154

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577


Corporation Name: Dr. V. Khokhotva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Khokhotva ( CPSO# 82935 )

Business Address:
1060 - 2109 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8Y 1R8
Phone Number: (519) 254-4154

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VLADISLAV KHOKHOTVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOKHOTVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010