Khoo, Adrian (CPSO#: 95305)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
155 Main Street East
Lower Level
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P2
Phone: (905) 945-5476
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 945-2253
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adrian Khoo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khoo ( CPSO# 95305 )

Business Address:
100 - 155 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P2
Phone Number: (905) 945-5476

Business Address:
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone Number: (905) 945-2253

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIAN KHOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2013