Khotianov, Natan Lvovitch (CPSO#: 73322)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Grodno State Medical Institute, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
5927 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M2R 3T5
Phone: (416) 512-2651
Fax: (416) 512-2653
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khotianov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Khotianov ( CPSO# 73322 )

Business Address:
102 - 5927 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M2R 3T5
Phone Number: (416) 512-2651

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATAN LVOVITCH KHOTIANOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOTIANOV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 24 May 2000
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 May 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jan 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2005